AB209
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 24, 2011.
By: Health and Human Services

Revises provisions governing the use by a local government of the money in certain funds that are designated for capital projects. (BDR 31-756)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Feb 23, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar 23, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Feb 24, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Feb 25, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 16, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)