SB203
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 28, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Leslie

Revises provisions relating to the classification and dispensing of certain precursors to methamphetamine. (BDR 40-648)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 14, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 29, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 12, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Feb 28, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 01, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 16, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)