SB205
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 01, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Leslie, Hardy, Mastroluca, Carlton, Bobzien

Requires national certification for a registered nurse to receive a certificate of recognition as an advanced practitioner of nursing. (BDR 54-84)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 232.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Mar 07, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 29, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 18, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Mar 14, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 28, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 653   

Bill History

Mar 01, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Mar 02, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 09, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 10, 2011

  • Read second time.

Mar 14, 2011

Mar 15, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 23, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 653.) To printer.

May 24, 2011

May 25, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 26, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 27, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 28, 2011

May 29, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 653 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 31, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 02, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 232.
  • Effective July 1, 2014.