SB206
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 01, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Leslie

Requires legislative lobbyists to file reports concerning lobbying activities when the Legislature is not in session. (BDR 17-1004)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar 29, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May 17, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     May 26, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 23, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 01, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Mar 02, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 08, 2011

  • EXEMPT, Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule 14.6.4(a).

May 18, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 19, 2011

  • Read second time.

May 20, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 23, 2011

May 25, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

Jun 06, 2011

  • (No further action taken.)