SB207
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 01, 2011.
By: Commerce, Labor and Energy

Authorizes the imposition of an administrative penalty against an employer under certain circumstances. (BDR 53-165)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Vetoed by the Governor.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Mar 30, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Finance     May 18, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Jun 01, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Jun 03, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 29, 2011   Yea 11,   Nay 10,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 04, 2011   Yea 25,   Nay 13,   Excused 4,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Proposed Amendments     Amend. No. 769   
Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 814   
Other Amendments   
(see bill history below)
 Amend. No. 769   

Bill History

Mar 01, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Mar 02, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 06, 2011

  • Read second time.
  • Taken from General File. Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To committee.

Apr 11, 2011

  • Notice of exemption.

May 28, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 814.) To printer.

May 29, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
  • Action rescinded.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 11, Nays: 10.) To Assembly.

May 30, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

Jun 03, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Jun 04, 2011

Jun 05, 2011

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

Jun 06, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 13, 2011

  • Vetoed by the Governor.