SB210
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 01, 2011.
By: Health and Human Services

Revises provisions governing the regulation of certain food processing establishments. (BDR 40-564)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 240.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 03, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 29, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 07, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 02, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 04, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, not agendized
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 20, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 29, 2011     06:46 PM          Minutes          Concur

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 26, 2011   Yea 12,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 28, 2011   Yea 39,   Nay 3,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 172     Amend. No. 702   

Bill History

Mar 01, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 02, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 25, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 26, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 172.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.)
  • To printer.

Apr 27, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 26, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 702.) To printer.

May 27, 2011

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 28, 2011

May 29, 2011

  • Assembly Amendment No. 702 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 31, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 03, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 240.
  • Effective July 1, 2011.