AB217
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 01, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Ellison, Hansen, Aizley, Anderson, Bobzien, Bustamante Adams, Carrillo, Goedhart, Goicoechea, Grady, Hambrick, Hammond, Hardy, Hickey, Kirkpatrick, Kirner, Kite, Livermore, McArthur, Munford, Sherwood, Stewart, Woodbury, Hardy, Settelmeyer, Gustavson, Brower, Lee, Manendo, McGinness

Repeals provisions governing the interstate sale of certain firearms. (BDR 52-596)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 38.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 07, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 09, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 18, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Mar 14, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 02, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Mar 01, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 02, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 10, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 11, 2011

  • Read second time.

Mar 14, 2011

Mar 16, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.

Apr 19, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 20, 2011

  • Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.

Apr 22, 2011

  • Read second time.

Apr 25, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 26, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 27, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 28, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 02, 2011

May 06, 2011

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 09, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 12, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 38.
  • Effective July 1, 2011.