AB221
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 01, 2011.
By: Commerce and Labor

Establishes provisions governing certain acts of pharmacists. (BDR 54-1015)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 01, 2011     11:02 AM          Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 04, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 28, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 04, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 146   

Bill History

Mar 01, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 02, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 19, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 146.) Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. To printer.

Apr 20, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 26, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)