SB213
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 02, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Schneider

Revises provisions governing the registration requirements for employee leasing companies. (BDR 53-1018)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 267.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Mar 09, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Mar 16, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 09, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 20, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Apr 25, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 28, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 93     Amend. No. 334   

Bill History

Mar 02, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Mar 03, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 06, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 07, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 93.) To printer.

Apr 08, 2011

Apr 11, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 14, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 15, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 18, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 19, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 20, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 22, 2011

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 334.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2011

Apr 26, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 23, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 25, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 26, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 27, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 28, 2011

May 29, 2011

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 31, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 04, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 267.
  • Effective October 1, 2011.