AB228
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 02, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Hickey, Hansen, Goedhart, Goicoechea, Grady, Hambrick, Hardy, Kirner, McArthur, Segerblom, Sherwood, Smith, Stewart

Directs the Commission to Study Governmental Purchasing to conduct a study on contracts for public works. (BDR S-582)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

CONTAINS UNFUNDED MANDATE
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 458.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar 14, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Not heard
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar 25, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr 14, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May 26, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May 31, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Jun 02, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 05, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 409     Amend. No. 890   

Bill History

Mar 02, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 03, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 23, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 22, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 409.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2011

Apr 26, 2011

  • In Senate.

Apr 27, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

Jun 04, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 890.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .

Jun 05, 2011

Jun 06, 2011

  • Senate Amendment No. 890 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 16, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor.

Jun 17, 2011

  • Chapter 458.
  • Effective July 1, 2011.