SB214
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 02, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Hardy, McGinness, Rhoads, Stewart, Hardy

Requires the Department of Transportation to establish a demonstration project for a toll road in connection with the Boulder City Bypass Project. (BDR S-842)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Transportation     Mar 31, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Transportation     Apr 12, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Transportation     Apr 14, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 11, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 20, 2011     09:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     Jun 05, 2011     02:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction   Dead Bill/Resolution
  Assembly Government Affairs     Jun 06, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, no jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 26, 2011   Yea 19,   Nay 2,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 507   

Bill History

Mar 02, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Mar 03, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 11, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 26, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 507.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 19, Nays: 2.)
  • To printer.

Apr 27, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 30, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)