AB230
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 03, 2011.
By: Education

Authorizes an alternative route to licensure for teachers and administrators. (BDR 34-738)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 488.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Education     Mar 02, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Education     Mar 07, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Education     Mar 21, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Education     Apr 13, 2011     02:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Education     May 11, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Education     May 20, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Mar 24, 2011   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 27, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 727   

Bill History

Mar 03, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 04, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 22, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 23, 2011

  • Read second time.

Mar 24, 2011

Mar 25, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

May 25, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 26, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 727.) To printer.

May 27, 2011

Jun 06, 2011

  • Senate Amendment No. 727 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 16, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 17, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 488.
  • Effective July 1, 2011.