AB232
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 03, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Woodbury, Aizley, Anderson, Ellison, Goedhart, Goicoechea, Grady, Hambrick, Hammond, Hardy, Hickey, Kirner, Kite, Livermore, McArthur, Sherwood, Stewart, Hardy, Gustavson, Settelmeyer

Revises provisions governing the payment of certain fees for permits to operate certain oversized and overweight vehicles on the highways of this State. (BDR 58-868)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 301.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Transportation     Mar 10, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Transportation     Mar 24, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Transportation     May 03, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Transportation     May 19, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 18, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 30, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 123   

Bill History

Mar 03, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Mar 04, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 15, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 15, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 123.) To printer.

Apr 18, 2011

Apr 19, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

May 28, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 29, 2011

  • Read second time.

May 30, 2011

May 31, 2011

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

Jun 02, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 10, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 301.
  • Effective June 10, 2011, for the purpose of adopting regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks that are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act and January 1, 2012, for all other purposes.