SJR7
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 03, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Gustavson, Halseth, McGinness, Settelmeyer, Goedhart, Goicoechea, Hammond, Hardy, McArthur, Sherwood, Stewart

Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to limit the total amount of property taxes that may be levied on real property. (BDR C-17)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr 12, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 03, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Mar 04, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 14, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 16, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)