SB221
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 07, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Wiener, Segerblom

Makes various changes relating to trusts, estates and probate. (BDR 2-78)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 270.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Mar 21, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 07, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action   Reschedule
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 12, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Judiciary     May 02, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Judiciary     May 19, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Judiciary     May 20, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May 28, 2011     08:02 PM          Minutes          Concur

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 26, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 28, 2011   Yea 28,   Nay 14,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 231     Amend. No. 743   

Bill History

Mar 07, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 08, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 25, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 26, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 231.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.)
  • To printer.

Apr 27, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 26, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 743.) To printer.

May 27, 2011

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 28, 2011

May 29, 2011

  • Assembly Amendment No. 743 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 31, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 04, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 270.
  • Effective October 1, 2011.