AB237
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 07, 2011.
By: Government Affairs

Authorizes counties to issue securities for projects and programs concerning public water and sewer systems. (BDR 20-243)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 135.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar 23, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar 30, 2011     07:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, not agendized
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr 11, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Government Affairs     May 04, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     May 11, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr 25, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 23, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Mar 07, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 08, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 15, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

Apr 18, 2011

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 22, 2011

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 25, 2011

Apr 26, 2011

  • In Senate.

Apr 27, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 13, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 14, 2011

  • Read second time.

May 16, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 18, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 19, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 20, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 23, 2011

May 25, 2011

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 27, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 29, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 135.
  • Effective May 29, 2011.