AB238
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 07, 2011.
By: Government Affairs

Revises provisions concerning the refunding of certain municipal securities. (BDR 20-244)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 268.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar 09, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, not agendized
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar 23, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr 11, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Government Affairs     May 04, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     May 11, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     May 18, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 27, 2011   Yea 15,   Nay 6,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 247     Amend. No. 633   

Bill History

Mar 07, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 08, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 22, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 247.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2011

Apr 26, 2011

  • In Senate.

Apr 27, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 25, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 26, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 633.) To printer.

May 27, 2011

May 30, 2011

  • Senate Amendment No. 633 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 31, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 04, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 268.
  • Effective June 4, 2011.