SB224
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 07, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Parks, Leslie, Denis, Wiener, Breeden, Copening, Halseth, Kihuen, Lee, Manendo, McGinness, Schneider, Settelmeyer, Hambrick, Oceguera, Smith, Frierson, Horne, Aizley, Anderson, Conklin, Hogan, Pierce

Requires certain substances known as fake cocaine to be included on the list of schedule I controlled substances. (BDR 40-990)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 15, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 29, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 09, 2011     10:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, no jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 07, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 08, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 11, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 16, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)