AB239
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 07, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Bobzien, Kirkpatrick, Benitez-Thompson, Smith, Pierce, Atkinson, Bustamante Adams, Conklin, Flores, Mastroluca, Oceguera

Requires public bodies to post on their websites, if any, certain material and records related to meetings of the public body. (BDR 19-527)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar 10, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr 22, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, no jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 07, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 08, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 16, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)