AB241
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 07, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Smith, Conklin, Oceguera, Bobzien, Kirkpatrick, Diaz

Creates stabilization accounts for public education funding. (BDR 31-147)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Ways and Means     Mar 09, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 07, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Mar 08, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 15, 2011

  • Notice of exemption.

Jun 06, 2011

  • (No further action taken.)