AB245
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 09, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Stewart, Ellison, Goicoechea, Grady, Hammond, Hardy, Hickey, Kirner, Kite, Livermore, McArthur, Sherwood, Hardy, Gustavson, Lee, Settelmeyer

Revises provisions governing eligibility for certain tax exemptions. (BDR 32-348)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 408.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Taxation     Mar 15, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Taxation     Apr 14, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 11, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 28, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass, as amended
  Senate Revenue     Jun 04, 2011     07:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 28, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 05, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 312   

Bill History

Mar 09, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Mar 10, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 25, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 312.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Apr 26, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 28, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass, as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

May 29, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue. To committee.

Jun 04, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

Jun 05, 2011

Jun 13, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 15, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor.

Jun 16, 2011

  • Chapter 408.
  • Effective July 1, 2011.