SB230
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 09, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Denis, Wiener, Breeden, Kihuen, Bobzien, Benitez-Thompson, Brooks, Bustamante Adams, Carrillo, Flores

Requires the boards of trustees of school districts and the governing bodies of charter schools to adopt a policy governing the use of foods and beverages containing trans fats at public schools within this State. (BDR 34-666)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Education     Mar 25, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Education     Apr 13, 2011     02:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Education     May 16, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 22, 2011   Yea 12,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 291   

Bill History

Mar 09, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 10, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 19, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 20, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 291.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2011

Apr 22, 2011

Apr 25, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

May 06, 2011

  • Withdrawn from committee.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Education.
  • To committee.

May 21, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)