AB253
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 10, 2011.
By: Commerce and Labor

Makes various changes concerning fines and settlement agreements relating to occupational safety and health. (BDR 53-100)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 09, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 16, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Senate Finance     Mar 18, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 11, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 11, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 13, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2011   Yea 27,   Nay 15,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 23, 2011   Yea 11,   Nay 10,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 218     Amend. No. 596   

Bill History

Mar 10, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 11, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 20, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 218.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2011

Apr 22, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 25, 2011

Apr 26, 2011

  • In Senate.

Apr 27, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.

May 18, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 19, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 596.) To printer.

May 20, 2011

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 23, 2011

May 25, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 596 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 27, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 01, 2011

  • Vetoed by the Governor.

Jun 02, 2011

  • Returned to Assembly with Governor's veto message.

Jun 06, 2011

  • Bill read.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.
  • (No further action taken.)