AB255
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 10, 2011.
By: Commerce and Labor

Revises procedures relating to certain accidents occurring in the course of employment. (BDR 53-102)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 346.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 09, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 16, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Senate Finance     Mar 18, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 11, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 14, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 24, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass, as amended
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 30, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Jun 01, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 25, 2011   Yea 38,   Nay 4,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 04, 2011   Yea 11,   Nay 10,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 222   

Bill History

Mar 10, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 11, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 23, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 20, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 222.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2011

Apr 22, 2011

  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 25, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass, as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 38, Nays: 4.) To Senate.

May 26, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.

Jun 02, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

Jun 03, 2011

  • Read second time.

Jun 04, 2011

Jun 06, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 13, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 346.
  • Effective January 1, 2012.