AB256
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 10, 2011.
By: Commerce and Labor

Revises various provisions governing workers' compensation. (BDR 53-1121)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 09, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 15, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Not heard

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 10, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 11, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 16, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)