AB258
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 10, 2011.
By: Judiciary

Revises provisions governing the licensing and operation of interactive gaming. (BDR 41-657)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 302.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar 10, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar 24, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 12, 2011     07:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 06, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 12, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May 24, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 19, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       May 30, 2011   Yea 19,   Nay 2,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 225     Amend. No. 605     Amend. No. 777   

Bill History

Mar 10, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 11, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 23, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 25, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Taken from Second Reading File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 225.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Apr 26, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 18, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 605.) To printer.

May 19, 2011

May 20, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 29, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 777.) To printer.

May 30, 2011

May 31, 2011

  • In Assembly.

Jun 01, 2011

  • Senate Amendment No. 777 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 03, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 10, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 302.
  • Effective June 10, 2011.