SB233
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 10, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Parks, Horsford, Kieckhefer, Oceguera, Conklin, Hansen, Brooks, Hardy, Anderson, Bustamante Adams, Kirkpatrick, Smith

Makes various changes concerning the administration of grants. (BDR 18-1058)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 310.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr 13, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr 15, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     May 02, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 10, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 20, 2011     09:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 26, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 29, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 344     Amend. No. 503     Amend. No. 699   

Bill History

Mar 10, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 11, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 11, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 20, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 22, 2011

  • Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

Apr 26, 2011

  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. Nos. 344 and 503.)
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.)
  • To Assembly.

Apr 27, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 28, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 699.) To printer.

May 29, 2011

May 30, 2011

  • In Senate.

Jun 02, 2011

  • Assembly Amendment No. 699 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 04, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 10, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 310.
  • Effective July 1, 2011.