AB261
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 11, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Hansen, Kirner, Carrillo, Diaz, Goedhart, Hammond, Hardy, Kite, Lee

Increases the monetary limit in actions for small claims adjudicated in a justice court. (BDR 6-1029)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 34.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar 29, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 05, 2011     07:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 06, 2011     07:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, not agendized
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 27, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 18, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 02, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 158   

Bill History

Mar 11, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 14, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 15, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 158.) To printer.

Apr 18, 2011

Apr 19, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

Apr 27, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 28, 2011

  • Read second time.

May 02, 2011

May 06, 2011

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 09, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 12, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 34.
  • Effective July 1, 2011.