AB264
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 11, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Kirkpatrick

Revises provisions relating to constables. (BDR 20-1097)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar 28, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Senate Judiciary     May 16, 2011     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Dead Bill/Resolution

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 11, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 14, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 16, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)