SB235
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 14, 2011.
By: Transportation

Makes failure to wear a safety belt in a motor vehicle a primary offense. (BDR 43-38)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Transportation     Mar 22, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Transportation     Mar 24, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Transportation     Apr 14, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass, failed

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 14, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Mar 15, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 16, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)