AB267
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 14, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Ohrenschall

Revises provisions governing representation of injured workers in hearings or other meetings concerning industrial insurance claims. (BDR 53-611)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 21, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 13, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 29, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 20, 2011   Yea 25,   Nay 17,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 287   

Bill History

Mar 14, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 15, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 19, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 287.) To printer.

Apr 20, 2011

Apr 22, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.

May 21, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)