SB238
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 14, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Manendo

Revises provisions concerning the Advisory Board on Automotive Affairs. (BDR 43-994)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 325.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Transportation     Mar 17, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Transportation     Mar 29, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Transportation     May 03, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Transportation     May 19, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 22, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 30, 2011   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 125     Amend. No. 668   

Bill History

Mar 14, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Mar 15, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 18, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 19, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 125.) To printer.

Apr 20, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 22, 2011

Apr 25, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

May 26, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 668.) To printer.

May 27, 2011

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 28, 2011

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

May 29, 2011

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 30, 2011

Jun 02, 2011

  • In Senate.

Jun 04, 2011

  • Assembly Amendment No. 668 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 06, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 13, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 325.
  • Section 2 effective June 13, 2011. Sections 1 and 3 effective July 1, 2011.