AB271
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 15, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Bustamante Adams, Horne, Conklin

Regulates private transfer fee obligations that affect real property. (BDR 10-628)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 77.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 08, 2011     07:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 13, 2011     07:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 28, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     May 05, 2011     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr 18, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 11, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 557   

Bill History

Mar 15, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 16, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 15, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

Apr 18, 2011

Apr 19, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 09, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 10, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 557.) To printer.

May 11, 2011

May 13, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 557 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 16, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 20, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 77.
  • Effective May 20, 2011.