AB274
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 15, 2011.
By: Commerce and Labor

Revises provisions relating to the payment of the proceeds of any benefits under a life insurance policy. (BDR 57-591)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 14, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 01, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 15, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 441   

Bill History

Mar 15, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 16, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 22, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 441.) Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. To printer.

Apr 25, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 26, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)