AB276
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 15, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Conklin, Kirkpatrick

Requires the State Controller to make certain data available for public inspection on an Internet website established and maintained by the State Controller. (BDR 18-371)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 139.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar 30, 2011     07:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Taxation     Mar 31, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, no jurisdiction
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr 08, 2011     07:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Government Affairs     May 13, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     May 16, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 23, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 495   

Bill History

Mar 15, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 16, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 25, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 495.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.)
  • To printer.

Apr 26, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.

Apr 27, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 18, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 19, 2011

  • Read second time.

May 20, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 23, 2011

May 25, 2011

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 27, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 29, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 139.
  • Effective May 29, 2011, for the purpose of adopting any regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks necessary to carry out the provisions of this act and July 1, 2012, for all other purposes.