SB242
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 16, 2011.
By: Commerce, Labor and Energy

Revises provisions relating to workers' compensation. (BDR 53-168)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Mar 30, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 16, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Mar 17, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 06, 2011

  • Read second time.

Apr 07, 2011

  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance.
  • To committee.

Apr 16, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)