AB279
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 15, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Ohrenschall

Authorizes independent testing laboratories to inspect and certify gaming devices, equipment and systems. (BDR 41-570)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 460.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 05, 2011     07:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 13, 2011     07:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 06, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun 04, 2011     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     Jun 06, 2011     12:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Jun 06, 2011     10:49 PM          Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 06, 2011   Yea 32,   Nay 10,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 07, 2011   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 1


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 258     Amend. No. 957   

Bill History

Mar 15, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 16, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 20, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 258.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2011

Apr 22, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 06, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 957.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 32, Nays: 10.)
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
  • From committee: Do pass. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Absent: 1.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

Jun 16, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor.

Jun 17, 2011

  • Chapter 460.
  • Effective June 16, 2011, for the purpose of adopting regulations and May 1, 2012, for all other purposes.