AB280
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 15, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Oceguera, Anderson, Mastroluca, Brooks, Conklin, Benitez-Thompson, Dondero Loop, Flores, Frierson, Horne, Kirkpatrick, Munford, Neal, Pierce, Manendo

Requires the adoption of patient safety checklists and patient safety policies at certain medical facilities. (BDR 40-517)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 140.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar 16, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar 25, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 28, 2011     03:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 05, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 12, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 11, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 23, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 110   

Bill History

Mar 15, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 16, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 08, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 110.) To printer.

Apr 11, 2011

Apr 14, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 13, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 14, 2011

  • Read second time.

May 16, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 18, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 19, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 20, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 23, 2011

May 25, 2011

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 27, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 29, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 140.
  • Effective July 1, 2011.