AB282
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 15, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Oceguera, Bobzien, Smith, Conklin, Kirkpatrick, Anderson, Benitez-Thompson, Brooks, Daly, Dondero Loop, Ellison, Flores, Frierson, Goedhart, Goicoechea, Hambrick, Hansen, Hardy, Hickey, Horne, Kirner, Kite, Livermore, McArthur, Munford, Neal, Stewart, Woodbury, Manendo, Brower, Cegavske, Denis, Gustavson, Halseth, Hardy, Kieckhefer, McGinness, Rhoads, Roberson, Settelmeyer

Revises various provisions concerning firearms. (BDR 15-962)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 490.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar 30, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 01, 2011     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 15, 2011     07:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May 11, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May 28, 2011     03:40 PM          Minutes          Do not recede

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Apr 26, 2011   Yea 40,   Nay 2,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (4th Reprint)       May 26, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    4th Reprint    5th Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 359     Amend. No. 528     Amend. No. 576     Amend. No. 780     Amend. No. CA4   

Bill History

Mar 15, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 16, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 22, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 359.)
  • Amendment No. 454 placed on Chief Clerk's desk.
  • To printer.

Apr 25, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 528.) To printer.

Apr 26, 2011

Apr 27, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 16, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 18, 2011

  • Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.

May 19, 2011

  • Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.

May 20, 2011

  • Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.

May 23, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 576.) To printer.

May 24, 2011

May 25, 2011

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 780.) To printer.

May 26, 2011

May 27, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 576 concurred in.
  • Senate Amendment No. 780 not concurred in. To Senate.

May 28, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Senate Amendment No. 780 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To Assembly.

May 29, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To committee.

Jun 05, 2011

  • From committee: Concur in Senate Amendment No. 780 and further amend. Conference report adopted by Assembly.

Jun 06, 2011

  • Conference report adopted by Senate.
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Fifth reprint .
  • To enrollment.

Jun 16, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 17, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 490.
  • Effective July 1, 2011.