AB286
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 16, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Hardy, Goedhart, Hambrick, Aizley, Anderson, Bustamante Adams, Ellison, Goicoechea, Grady, Hammond, Hansen, Hickey, Hogan, Kirner, Kite, Livermore, Munford, Neal, Sherwood, Stewart, Woodbury, Parks, Hardy, Schneider, Cegavske, Denis, Lee, Manendo, Rhoads, Roberson, Settelmeyer

Establishes the Advisory Committee on Medicaid Fraud. (BDR S-693)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar 25, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 13, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Without recommendation, and rerefer
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun 03, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 16, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 17, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 15, 2011

  • From committee: Without recommendation, and rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 06, 2011

  • (No further action taken.)