AB287
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 16, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Kirkpatrick, Atkinson, Conklin, Carlton, Oceguera

Creates the Nevada Renewable Energy Transmission Authority. (BDR 58-520)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 30, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 11, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Without recommendation, and rerefer

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 16, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 17, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 15, 2011

  • From committee: Without recommendation, and rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 06, 2011

  • (No further action taken.)