SB247
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 16, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Wiener

Establishes the Program for School-Based Health Centers. (BDR 34-112)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Education     Apr 06, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Education     Apr 13, 2011     02:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 16, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 17, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 16, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)