SB249
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 16, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Parks, Denis, Manendo, Anderson

Makes various changes relating to administration of taxes on property. (BDR 32-793)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 512.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Revenue     Mar 29, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Revenue     Apr 05, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Revenue     Apr 12, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Taxation     May 17, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Taxation     May 19, 2011     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 26, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 30, 2011   Yea 38,   Nay 4,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 463     Amend. No. 838     Amend. No. CA7   

Bill History

Mar 16, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue. To printer.

Mar 17, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 25, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 26, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 463.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.)
  • To printer.

Apr 27, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee.

May 30, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 838.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 38, Nays: 4.)
  • To printer.

May 31, 2011

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • To Senate.

Jun 02, 2011

  • In Senate.

Jun 03, 2011

  • Assembly Amendment No. 838 not concurred in. To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 838 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate.

Jun 04, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee.

Jun 06, 2011

  • From committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment No. 838 and further amend.
  • Conference report adopted by Senate.
  • Conference report adopted by Assembly.
  • To printer.

Jun 08, 2011

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
  • To enrollment.

Jun 16, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 17, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 512.
  • Sections 2 to 5, inclusive, 10, 11, 12 to 15, inclusive, and 16 effective June 17, 2011. Sections 1, 6, 7, 9.5, 11.5, 15.5, 17 and 18 effective July 1, 2011.