SB250
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 17, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Kieckhefer

Makes various changes relating to state financial administration. (BDR 31-749)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Government Affairs     Mar 23, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr 08, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr 13, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Proposed Amendments     Amend. No. 256   
Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 537   
Other Amendments   
(see bill history below)
 Amend. No. 256   

Bill History

Mar 17, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 18, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 25, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 26, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 537.)
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 27, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 07, 2011

  • (No further action taken.)