SB251
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 17, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Kieckhefer, Smith, Brooks, Hansen

Creates the Sunset Subcommittee of the Legislative Commission to evaluate certain governmental programs and services. (BDR 18-745)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 480.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Government Affairs     Mar 23, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr 06, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr 07, 2011     06:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, no jurisdiction
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr 14, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, no jurisdiction
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr 29, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 18, 2011     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May 31, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 22, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 30, 2011   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 151     Amend. No. 805   

Bill History

Mar 17, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 18, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 14, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 15, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 151.) To printer.

Apr 18, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 19, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 20, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 22, 2011

Apr 25, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 29, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 805.) To printer.

May 30, 2011

Jun 02, 2011

  • In Senate.

Jun 03, 2011

  • Assembly Amendment No. 805 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 16, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor.

Jun 17, 2011

  • Chapter 480.
  • Section 15.5 effective June 16, 2011. Sections 1, 1.5 and 8 to 15, inclusive, effective July 1, 2011.