AB299
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 17, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Atkinson, Conklin, Kirkpatrick, Aizley, Anderson, Benitez-Thompson, Bustamante Adams, Carlton, Diaz, Flores, Frierson, Hogan, Horne, Munford, Oceguera, Pierce, Smith

Creates the Low-Cost Automobile Insurance Pilot Program. (BDR 57-178)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 01, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 11, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 06, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 20, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2011   Yea 26,   Nay 16,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 26, 2011   Yea 29,   Nay 13,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 221   

Bill History

Mar 17, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 18, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 19, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 221.) To printer.

Apr 20, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 22, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 25, 2011

Apr 26, 2011

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 29, Nays: 13.) To Senate.

Apr 27, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.

May 23, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 25, 2011

  • Read second time.

May 26, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 27, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 28, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

May 31, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)