SB255
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 17, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Breeden

Reduces the amount of governmental services taxes imposed on certain older motor vehicles. (BDR 32-351)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Revenue     Apr 14, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Without recommendation and rerefer

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 17, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue. To printer.

Mar 18, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 11, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 15, 2011

  • From committee: Without recommendation and rerefer to the Committee on Finance.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 07, 2011

  • (No further action taken.)