SB256
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 17, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Hardy, Denis, Copening

Revises provisions relating to controlled substances. (BDR 40-419)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 29, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 11, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 22, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 211   

Bill History

Mar 17, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 18, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 14, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 15, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 211.) To printer.

Apr 18, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 19, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 20, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 22, 2011

Apr 25, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 21, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)