SB257
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 17, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Wiener

Revises various provisions governing graffiti offenses. (BDR 15-616)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 282.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Mar 29, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 07, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Judiciary     May 11, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Judiciary     May 19, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May 31, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Concur

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 22, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 29, 2011   Yea 40,   Nay 2,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 163     Amend. No. 794   

Bill History

Mar 17, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 18, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 19, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 20, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 163.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2011

Apr 22, 2011

Apr 25, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 28, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 794.) To printer.

May 29, 2011

May 30, 2011

  • In Senate.

May 31, 2011

  • Assembly Amendment No. 794 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 02, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 10, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 282.
  • Effective October 1, 2011.