SB259
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 17, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Schneider

Revises provisions governing certain trust companies. (BDR 55-629)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 324.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Mar 23, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 08, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 04, 2011     12:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 18, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 22, 2011   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 28, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 193     Amend. No. 654   

Bill History

Mar 17, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Mar 18, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 18, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 19, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 193.) To printer.

Apr 20, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 22, 2011

Apr 25, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 23, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 654.) To printer.

May 24, 2011

May 25, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 26, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 27, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 28, 2011

May 29, 2011

  • In Senate.

Jun 04, 2011

  • Assembly Amendment No. 654 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 06, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 13, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 324.
  • Effective June 13, 2011.